HI SB954 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB954
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-27 - Referred to HRE, WAM.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-27 - Referred to HRE, WAM.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the University of Hawaii to provide menstrual products free of charge to all students on any University of Hawaii campus, including the community colleges.
Title
Relating To Menstrual Equity.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB954 (Carry Over) 2023-01-27 - Referred to HRE, WAM.
HB481 (Same As) 2023-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and none excused (0).
HB481 (Same As) 2023-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and none excused (0).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=954&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/SB954_.HTM |