HI SB954 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-04 - The committee on EGH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-04 - The committee on EGH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires any report of a study or an audit made by an executive department or agency, including the Hawaii health systems corporation, and by the legislative reference bureau, auditor, judiciary, or office of Hawaiian affairs, to be submitted to the clerk of each house, senate president, speaker of the house, chairs of the appropriate subject matter committee of each house, and the legislative reference bureau library. Requires a public hearing or informational briefing, except if waived by the senate president or speaker of the house of representatives. Excludes certain routine reports.
Title
Legislative Hearings; Studies and Reports
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Sam Slom [R] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-04 | Senate | The committee on EGH deferred the measure. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH deferred the measure until 02-04-13 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-13 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EGH, WAM. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=954&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SB954_.HTM |