HI SB954 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-16 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-16 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends current law to require a transition plan for children once they have reached the age of fourteen. Gives children in the foster care system the option to remain under the jurisdiction of the family court system until they reach the age of twenty-one. (SD1)
Title
Foster Children; Foster Care; Extended Jurisdiction
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] |
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-16 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. | |
2011-02-16 | (S) Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 260) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. | |
2011-02-11 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Chun Oakland, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Ihara. | |
2011-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 02-11-11 2:30PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-11 1:45PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to HMS, JDL. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |