HI SB948 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-26 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 4:30PM in Conference Room 309.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-26 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 4:30PM in Conference Room 309.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands application of the general excise tax to business activities in the State that are significantly associated with a seller's ability to establish or maintain a market in the State. Creates a presumption under the general excise tax law for sellers of tangible personal property where the seller's activities in the State demonstrate a significant business nexus with the State. Creates a presumption under the use tax law that a seller is engaged in business in the State if the seller's activities in the State demonstrate a significant business nexus with the State. Effective July 1, 2030. (SB948 HD1)
Title
General Excise Tax; Use Tax
Sponsors
Sen. David Ige [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 4:30PM in Conference Room 309. |
2013-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-13 1:30PM in conference room 309. |
2013-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-13 3:00PM in conference room 309. |
2013-04-18 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-22-13 3:00PM in conference room 309. |
2013-04-17 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-18-13 3:00PM in conference room 309. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Luke Chair; Cullen, Nishimoto. |
2013-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692). |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Ige, Chair; Chun Oakland, Kidani, Kouchi, Ruderman. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 578). |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, Ing, Kawakami, Yamane voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cheape, Fale, Fukumoto, Johanson, McDermott, Thielen, Ward voting no (7) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Cheape, Johanson voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, Fukumoto, McDermott, Thielen, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) Say, Tokioka excused (2). |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1471) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-04-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cullen, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Johanson, Ing; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Ward; and Excused: none. |
2013-04-03 | House | Proposed House Draft of Bill re-scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-04-13 2:14PM in conference room 308. |
2013-04-03 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 04-04-13 2:14PM in conference room 308. |
2013-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-04-13 2:14PM in conference room 308. |
2013-03-14 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-03-11 | House | Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-14-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 253) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 468) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele, Tokuda. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-12-13 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |