HI SB938 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB938
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to LAT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to LAT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that moneys in the tourism emergency special fund are to be used exclusively for emergency measures directly related to safety and security initiatives necessary to respond to any tourism emergency. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Tourism.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to LAT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 308) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 872) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-02-21 10:05AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 90) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-21 3:00PM in conference room 224. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to EET, WAM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB938 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Referred to LAT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22