HI SB937 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB937
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that a simple majority of affirmative votes of the members of the Land Use Commission present at a meeting and qualified to vote is required for any boundary amendment. Reduces the number of days by when the Land Use Commission must act for certain actions related to amendments to district boundaries. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Land Use Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to HSG/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 313) in amended form (SD 1). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 18; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 7 (Senator(s) Awa, DeCoite, Fukunaga, Ihara, Kidani, Kim, McKelvey). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1104) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-03-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 521) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang, McKelvey, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-23 12:30PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Re-Referred to WTL, JDC/WAM. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to WTL, JDC. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB937 (Carry Over) 2023-03-09 - Referred to HSG/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 17
HB670 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB670 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.