HI SB930 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB930
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Facilitates the timely interconnection and transmission lines for renewable energy projects. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Renewable Energy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 348) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/WAM. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Re-Referred to EET, CPN/WAM. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-21 3:00PM in conference room 224. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to EET, CPN. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB115 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB930 (Carry Over) 2021-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM.
SB930 (Carry Over) 2021-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM.