HI SB925 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB925

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifies that the secondhand dealers law applies to a secondhand dealer's operation of an automated recycling kiosk. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Secondhand Dealers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-03-12HouseRe-referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 23
2021-03-11HouseReferred to ECD, CPC, JHA, referral sheet 22
2021-03-11HousePass First Reading
2021-03-09HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 304) in amended form (SD 2).
2021-03-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2021-03-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
2021-03-05SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 845) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2021-03-03SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Acasio.
2021-02-25SenateThe committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 03-03-21 10:24AM; Via Videoconference.
2021-02-19SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-25-21 9:30AM; Via Videoconference.
2021-02-18SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2021-02-18SenateReported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 386) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2021-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Nishihara ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-21 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2021-01-29SenateReferred to CPN, JDC.
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB352 (Same As)
SB925 (Carry Over) 2021-03-12 - Re-referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 23

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback