HI SB922 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB922
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-21 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-21 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates and authorizes funds for fiscal biennium 2017-2019 for collective bargaining cost items, salary increases, and other cost adjustments for collective bargaining unit (10) and their excluded counterparts. (SB922 HD1)
Title
Relating To Public Employment Cost Items.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). |
2017-03-21 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1177) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-03-14 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakashima, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-14-17 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2017-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 55) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Gabbard). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-03-17. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 585) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, English, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-21-17 10:05AM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 366) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-17 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB922 (Carry Over) 2017-03-21 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).
HB1056 (Same As) 2017-01-27 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 5
HB1056 (Same As) 2017-01-27 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 5