HI SB919 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the land use commission to establish a transfer of development rights program. Specifies certain requirements for transfer of development rights. Allows the creation of a transfer of development rights credit bank. Establishes the conservation stewardship fund. Requires the commission to adopt rules. Appropriates funds from the environmental response revolving fund.
Title
Conservation; Transfer of Development Rights; Land Use Commission; Zoning; Environmental Response Revolving Fund; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-11 | Senate | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | The committee on EGH deferred the measure. |
2013-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/EGH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-13 2:50PM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to WTL/EGH, WAM. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1016 (Same As) 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=919&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB919_.HTM |