HI SB913 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Act 049, 4/23/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1149).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Act 049, 4/23/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1149).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a time share plan's disclosure of the financial obligation of the purchaser to consist of: (1) A statement that the purchaser is obligated to pay the initial price in the purchase agreement; and (2) A list or description of any additional charges. Clarifies that a sales or acquisition agent is not required to provide any promotional device or instrument to a prospective purchaser prior to making a sales presentation. (SD1)
Title
Time Shares; Disclosures; Prohibited Activities
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Senate | Act 049, 4/23/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1149). |
2013-04-24 | House | Act 049, on 4/23/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1149). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 476). |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1578), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-04-02 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson, Ward. |
2013-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-02-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (3). |
2013-03-22 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1121), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-03-18 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Cabanilla, Cachola, Evans, Ito, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Carroll, Har, McDermott. |
2013-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-18-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-14 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-18-13. |
2013-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-14-13 5:30PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2013-02-19 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-02-15 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 28) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Shimabukuro, Solomon). Transmitted to House. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-15-13. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 250) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Solomon, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-06-13 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-13 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1192 (Same As) 2013-01-28 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6