HI SB910 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB910
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for Imi Hoola student stipends or for other Imi Hoola student support programs at the discretion of the department of native Hawaiian health of the John A. Burns school of medicine.
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HRE/HWN, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB910 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to HRE/HWN, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=910&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB910_.HTM |