HI SB908 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB908

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Extends the renewal period from two years to four years for licensees who are seventy-two years of age or older but younger than eighty years of age; provided their driving record does not include two or more moving traffic violation convictions after the licensee attained the age of seventy-two years. Defines moving traffic violation. Takes effect 1/1/2050. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Driver's Licenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-18SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2021-02-18SenateReported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 338) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2021-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, English, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-21 3:00PM in conference room 224.
2021-01-29SenateReferred to TRS, JDC.
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB458 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB908 (Carry Over) 2021-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback