HI SB90 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - The committee(s) on LHE recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates funds for operating expenses of the Department of Education. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Department Of Education.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19HouseThe committee(s) on LHE recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2019-03-15HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-19-19 2:15PM in conference room 309.
2019-03-12HouseThe committee(s) on LHE recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2019-03-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Tuesday, 03-12-19 2:30PM in House conference room 309.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 42) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1116) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-02-28SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-19 10:30AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-08SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-02-08SenateReported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 125) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-01-28SenateThe committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-19 2:45PM in conference room 229.
2019-01-17SenateReferred to EDU, WAM.
2019-01-17SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback