HI SB895 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the lapse date of funds appropriated from the emergency and budget reserve fund for the housing first pilot program to December 31, 2011. The legislature appropriated the funds for the program pursuant to Act 191, Session Laws of Hawaii 2010.
Title
Emergency and Budget Reserve Fund; Housing First Pilot Program; Appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] |
Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) The committee on HMS deferred the measure. | |
2011-02-11 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-11 1:30PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to HMS, WAM. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=895 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB895_.HTM |