HI SB894 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Excludes real estate licensees from the definition of distressed property consultant in Act 137, Session Laws of Hawaii 2008, the Mortgage Foreclosure Rescue Fraud Prevention Act, and adds to section 467-14, Hawaii Revised Statutes, prohibitions against certain conduct by real estate licensees that specifically relate to distressed property.
Title
Mortgage Rescue Fraud Prevention Act; Real Estate Licensees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Referred to CPN. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1076 (Same As) 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=894&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB894_.htm |