HI SB887 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB887
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the stabilization fund. Caps employer contributions to the other post-employment benefits trust fund. Transfers excess funds over the established cap from other post-employment benefits trust fund to the stabilization fund to cover cost increases of providing health and other benefits plans for active employees and retirees and their dependents.
Title
Relating To Unfunded Liabilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Laura Acasio [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to LCA, WAM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB276 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB887 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to LCA, WAM.
SB887 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to LCA, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=887&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB887_.HTM |