HI SB881 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB881
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a grant program to provide financial support for agriculture-related improvements to existing and emerging farms and agribusiness operations. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Agriculture.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 89) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-17 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1015 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
SB881 (Carry Over) 2017-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
SB881 (Carry Over) 2017-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.