HI SB872 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB872
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-16 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-16 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the State Ethics Commission to employ or retain its own attorneys. (SB872 HD1)
Title
Relating To Ethics.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen Co-Chairs; Thielen. |
2018-04-16 | House | Re-referred to JUD, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 57 |
2018-04-12 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 784). |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 557). |
2018-04-10 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1958-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto. |
2018-03-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-03-18 10:30AM in House conference room 308. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6). |
2017-03-24 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1277), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-03-22 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, Morikawa, Nakashima, Oshiro, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2017-03-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-22-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2017-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 45) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Gabbard). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-03-17. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 647) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Inouye, Wakai. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-27-17 9:35AM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 514) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-17 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB512 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
SB872 (Carry Over) 2017-03-24 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
SB872 (Carry Over) 2017-03-24 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).