HI SB870 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of education to establish and implement a searchable budget database website that will be made publicly available no later than 07/01/2012.
Title
Education; Searchable Budget Database
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
Sen. Pohai Ryan [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Sam Slom [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to EDU, WAM. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=870 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB870_.HTM |