HI SB868 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Belatti, Hanohano, Har, McKelvey, Morikawa, Onishi, Oshiro, Takumi, Tokioka, Yamashita voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aquino, Cheape, Cullen, Fale, Fukumoto, Johanson, Kawakami, McDermott, Thielen, Ward, Yamane voting no (11) and none excused (0).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Belatti, Hanohano, Har, McKelvey, Morikawa, Onishi, Oshiro, Takumi, Tokioka, Yamashita voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aquino, Cheape, Cullen, Fale, Fukumoto, Johanson, Kawakami, McDermott, Thielen, Ward, Yamane voting no (11) and none excused (0).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires mandatory and binding arbitration if an employer imposes any term of a collective bargaining agreement proposal without the agreement of the exclusive representative. Effective January 1, 2113. (SB868 HD1)
Title
Collective Bargaining; Public Employment; Arbitration
Sponsors
Sen. Clayton Hee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Belatti, Hanohano, Har, McKelvey, Morikawa, Onishi, Oshiro, Takumi, Tokioka, Yamashita voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aquino, Cheape, Cullen, Fale, Fukumoto, Johanson, Kawakami, McDermott, Thielen, Ward, Yamane voting no (11) and none excused (0). |
2013-03-19 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1026) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-03-12 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Hashem, Ichiyama, Ing; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Aquino, Takumi, Yamashita; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Yamane, Johanson; and Excused: none. |
2013-03-08 | House | Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-12-13 9:00AM in House conference room 309. Copy of proposed draft available at www.capitol.hawaii.gov. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 218) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 721) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 177) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-13 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |