HI SB865 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB865
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - The committee on HOU deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - The committee on HOU deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes cash payments made by developers in lieu of providing the required reserved housing units in the development of residential projects for the Hawaii community development authority to be deposited into the rental housing revolving fund.
Title
Relating To Affordable Housing.
Sponsors
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-04 | Senate | The committee on HOU deferred the measure. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-21 1:00PM in conference room 225. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to HOU, WAM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB865 (Carry Over) 2021-02-04 - The committee on HOU deferred the measure.
HB519 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Referred to HSG, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 1
HB519 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Referred to HSG, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=865&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB865_.HTM |