HI SB861 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB861
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-09 - Referred to HSG/LMG, FIN, referral sheet 17
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-09 - Referred to HSG/LMG, FIN, referral sheet 17
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the Legislative Reference Bureau to propose and conduct a study of a housing savings account system. Authorizes the Legislative Reference Bureau to contract for services to develop the proposed system and program and conduct a study. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Housing Savings Accounts.
Sponsors
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to HSG/LMG, FIN, referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 292) in amended form (SD 2). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 888) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2023-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Reported from HOU/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 378) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Aquino, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-23 1:30PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HOU/GVO, WAM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB861 (Carry Over) 2023-03-09 - Referred to HSG/LMG, FIN, referral sheet 17