HI SB858 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB858
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Health to establish a task force to plan the certification and training process for community health workers and submit a report to the legislature. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Community Health Workers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-03-04 | Senate | The committee on CPN deferred the measure. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM/CPN will hold a public decision making on 03-04-21 9:35AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/CPN. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 498) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/CPN. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-21 1:05PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Re-Referred to HTH, WAM/CPN. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to HTH, CPN. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB858 (Carry Over) 2021-03-04 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.