HI SB853 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the elections commission to conduct a performance evaluation of the chief election officer every six months. (SB853 HD1)
Title
Elections Commission; Evaluation of Chief Election Officer
Sponsors
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] |
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 5:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 1:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-13 1:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-18-13 2:30PM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Rhoads Chair; Brower, C. Lee, Thielen. |
2013-04-09 | House | Received notice of disagreement and Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 596). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Shimabukuro, Co-Chair(s); Slom. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Deferred until 04-09-13. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Deferred until 04-05-13. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Deferred until 04-04-13. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Deferred until 04-03-13. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 401). |
2013-04-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McKelvey excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-28 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, C. Lee, Tokioka excused (3). |
2013-03-28 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1234) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-03-14 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Belatti, Brower, Ito, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tsuji, Wooley, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll. |
2013-03-14 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2013-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-14-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 214) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 542) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2013-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-15-13 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-13 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB568 (Same As) 2013-03-07 - Referred to JDL.