HI SB848 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a state employee or legislator to disclose every source of annual income that totals more than the employee's or legislator's annual salary if that source is a registered lobbyist or lobbying organization. Effective July 1, 2113. (SB848 HD1)
Title
Legislators; State Employees; Disclosure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-04-02 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 04-02-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (3). |
2013-03-22 | House | Reported from LMG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1160) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2013-03-21 | House | The committees on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Mizuno, Awana, Cachola, McKelvey, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Saiki. |
2013-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LMG on Thursday, 03-21-13 2:00PM in House conference room 423. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to LMG, JUD, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 213) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 645) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-26-13 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |