HI SB836 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB836

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee

Summary

Allows the department of education to offer voluntary training for teachers and educational officers on sex trafficking prevention. Requires the department to provide explanatory information about sex trafficking prevention and response to teachers and educational officers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Education.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-30 Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
2017-03-24HouseRe-referred to FIN, referral sheet 35
2017-03-09HouseReferred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 27
2017-03-09HousePass First Reading
2017-03-07HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 271).
2017-03-07SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2017-03-03SenateOne Day Notice 03-07-17.
2017-03-03SenateReported from WAM/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 846) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2017-02-28SenateThe committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim.
2017-02-28SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Wakai.
2017-02-24SenateThe committee(s) on WAM/JDL will hold a public decision making on 02-28-17 9:50AM in conference room 211.
2017-02-17SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM/JDL.
2017-02-17SenateReported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 406) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM/JDL.
2017-02-13SenateThe committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Riviere.
2017-02-09SenateThe committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-17 2:45PM in conference room 229.
2017-01-30SenateRe-Referred to EDU, WAM/JDL.
2017-01-23SenateReferred to EDU/JDL, WAM.
2017-01-23SenatePassed First Reading.
2017-01-20SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB949 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
SB836 (Carry Over) 2017-03-24 - Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 35

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback