HI HB949 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB949
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the department of education to offer voluntary training for teachers and educational officers on sex trafficking prevention. Requires the department to provide explanatory information about sex trafficking prevention and response to teachers and educational officers.
Title
Relating To Education.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Todd [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to EDN, JUD, referral sheet 4 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB949 (Carry Over) 2017-01-27 - Referred to EDN, JUD, referral sheet 4
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=949&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB949_.HTM |