HI SB835 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB835
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Higher Education & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Higher Education & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the requirement that the annual general fund budget appropriation for the University of Hawaii shall be 3 to 5 times the estimated regular tuition and related fee revenues for that year.
Title
Relating To General Fund Budget Appropriations For The University Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to HET, FIN, referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-02 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-02-22 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 26). |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | One Day Notice 02-22-23. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 657) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kidani, Kim, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Kanuha, Lee, Moriwaki. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-15-23 10:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 151) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fukunaga ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB835 (Carry Over) 2023-03-09 - Referred to HET, FIN, referral sheet 17