HI SB835 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB835
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-29 - Referred to HTH, CPN.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-29 - Referred to HTH, CPN.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that plans of correction and the status of corrective actions for care facilities shall be added to reports by the department of health within five working days. Clarifies, for reporting purposes, that the conclusion of an inspection occurs after the initial visit to a facility is completed.
Title
Relating To Inspections Of Care Facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to HTH, CPN. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB835 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to HTH, CPN.
HB488 (Same As) 2021-02-02 - The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB488 (Same As) 2021-02-02 - The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=835&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB835_.HTM |