HI HB488 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB488
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-02 - The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-02 - The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that plans of correction and the status of corrective actions for care facilities shall be added to reports by the department of health within five working days. Clarifies, for reporting purposes, that the conclusion of an inspection occurs after the initial visit to a facility is completed.
Title
Relating To Inspections Of Care Facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-02 | House | The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 02-02-21 9:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB488 (Carry Over) 2021-02-02 - The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB835 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - Referred to HTH, CPN.
SB835 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - Referred to HTH, CPN.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=488&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB488_.HTM |