HI SB830 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB830
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that where public access is required as a condition of a subdivision, either the county must accept dedication of and maintain the access or identify an entity to own and maintain the access. Authorizes the county to require the subdivider to establish a stewardship fund for maintenance purposes.
Title
Relating To Public Access.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to PSM/WTL, JDC/WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB830 (Carry Over) 2019-02-11 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
HB344 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3
HB344 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=830&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB830_.HTM |