HI SB828 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB828
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to JDC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to JDC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a member of the legislature from serving more than twelve consecutive years in the house of representatives and twelve consecutive years in the senate. Effective upon ratification of constitutional amendment.
Title
Relating To Elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB828 (Carry Over) 2017-01-23 - Referred to JDL, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=828&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB828_.HTM |