HI SB828 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-28 - Referred to HTH/CPN.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-28 - Referred to HTH/CPN.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes the requirement that applicants for a license in psychology complete one year of post doctoral training and replaces it with required hours of supervised experience during the doctoral degree program.
Title
Psychologist; Licensure; Post Doctoral Training Requirement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HTH/CPN. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1125 (Same As) 2015-02-02 - Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 6
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=828&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SB828_.HTM |