HI SB825 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB825
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires chairs of legislative committees to make certain determinations when bills directly affecting the moneys appropriated to the department of education are deliberated on by their committees and to place those determinations in the accompanying committee reports.
Title
Relating To Education.
Sponsors
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to EDU, JDC/WAM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB452 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB825 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to EDU, JDC/WAM.
SB825 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to EDU, JDC/WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=825&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB825_.HTM |