HI HB452 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB452
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires chairs of legislative committees to make certain determinations when bills directly affecting the moneys appropriated to the department of education are deliberated on by their committees and to place those determinations in the accompanying committee reports.
Title
Relating To Education.
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Jeanne Kapela [D] |
Rep. Lisa Marten [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. Adrian Tam [D] |
Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to EDN, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB825 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB452 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to EDN, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 1
HB452 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to EDN, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=452&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB452_.HTM |