HI SB824 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-24 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting no (0) and Har, Riviere, Wooley excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-24 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting no (0) and Har, Riviere, Wooley excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes null and unenforceable any portion of a motor carrier transportation services contract or agreement that requires the carrier to indemnify, defend, or hold harmless the other party from any liability for that party's negligence or intentional acts or omissions. Effective July 1, 2011. (SB824 HD1)
Title
Motor Carriers; Transportation Services; Indemnification
Sponsors
Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Sen. Pohai Ryan [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-24 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting no (0) and Har, Riviere, Wooley excused (3). | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1112) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD. | |
2011-03-21 | (H) The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Ichiyama, Cullen, M. Lee, Luke, Takumi, Yamashita, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Saiki. | |
2011-03-17 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 03-21-11 9:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to TRN, CPC/JUD, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 198) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 608) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-20 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-24-11 9:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-02-02 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. | |
2011-02-02 | (S) Reported from TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 9) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TIA were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Espero, Dela Cruz, Gabbard, Kahele, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. | |
2011-01-25 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-11 1:15PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to TIA, JDL. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |