HI SB814 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-07 - Vetoed on 07-07-23 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1362).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-07 - Vetoed on 07-07-23 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1362).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Office of Enterprise Technology Services, in consultation with the Office of Language Access and a working group comprising stakeholders, to develop and publish, and periodically review and update, electronic information technology multilingual accessibility standards to be implemented by all state entities. Appropriates funds for one full-time equivalent (1.00 FTE) position. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Electronic Information Technology Accessibility For Persons With Limited English Proficiency.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-07 | Senate | Vetoed on 07-07-23 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1362). |
2023-07-07 | House | Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1362). |
2023-06-23 | Senate | Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-23-23 (Gov. Msg. No. 1232) |
2023-06-23 | House | Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1232) |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 901). |
2023-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 996). |
2023-05-04 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Martinez excused (2). |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1) Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Deferred One Day 05-04-23. |
2023-05-02 | House | Deferred one day 05-04-23. |
2023-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-23. |
2023-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 152) as amended in (CD 1). |
2023-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-23. |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 152). |
2023-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Martinez, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Aquino; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-23 4:00PM; Conference Room 225 |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-23 9:50AM; Conference Room 016. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-23 9:50AM; Conference Room 016. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-23 9:00AM; Conference Room 016. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 840). |
2023-04-21 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Matayoshi, Garrett Co-Chairs; Martinez, Alcos. |
2023-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 904). |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: McKelvey Chair; Aquino Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2023-04-13 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 888). |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 754). |
2023-04-11 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Martinez, Todd excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-04-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-11-23. |
2023-04-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2110) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-04-03 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-03-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-03-23 2:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa excused (1). |
2023-03-22 | House | Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1441) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-03-21 | House | The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Kapela, Sayama, Tam; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Martinez, Alcos. |
2023-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO on Tuesday, 03-21-23 9:30AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 274) in amended form (SD 2). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 926) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2023-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-23 10:10AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 491) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, San Buenaventura, Wakai, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-23 3:10PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Accessibility
Appropriation
Electronic Information Technology
Expenditure Ceiling ($)
Limited English Proficiency
Multilingual
Office of Enterprise Technology Services
Office of Language Access
Procurement
Standards
Working Group
Appropriation
Electronic Information Technology
Expenditure Ceiling ($)
Limited English Proficiency
Multilingual
Office of Enterprise Technology Services
Office of Language Access
Procurement
Standards
Working Group