HI SB804 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-28 - The committee on TIA deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-28 - The committee on TIA deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the operator of a bicycle to provide an audible warning by bell, horn, or other sound emitting mechanism when approaching and overtaking a pedestrian on a sidewalk or sidewalk area.
Title
Bicycle Safety; Sidewalks; Pedestrians; Warning Sound
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-28 | Senate | The committee on TIA deferred the measure. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-13 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to TIA, JDL. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB89 (Same As) 2013-01-22 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 2
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=804&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SB804_.HTM |