HI SB803 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB803
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-08 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-08 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes a provision designating the Hawaii convention center as the location for operation of a Hawaiian center and the museum of Hawaiian music and dance.
Title
Relating To Hawaiian Culture.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 135) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-19 3:00PM in conference room 414. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EET, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB803 (Carry Over) 2019-02-08 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
HB420 (Same As) 2019-07-03 - Act 171, 06/27/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1273).
HB420 (Same As) 2019-07-03 - Act 171, 06/27/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1273).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=803&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB803_.HTM |