HI SB801 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB801
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a public investment fund to develop, publish, and implement socially responsible investment policies applicable to the management of all public funds under the public investment fund's control and submit an annual report to the legislature on disclosing its investments in accord with environmental, social, and governance investing and socially responsible investment policies.
Title
Relating To Sustainable Investing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Re-Referred to GVO, WAM/JDC. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to GVO, JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1205 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB801 (Carry Over) 2021-02-03 - Re-Referred to GVO, WAM/JDC.
SB801 (Carry Over) 2021-02-03 - Re-Referred to GVO, WAM/JDC.
Subjects
Environmental, Social, And Governance Investing
Public Investment Funds
Socially Responsible Investing
Sustainable Investing
Public Investment Funds
Socially Responsible Investing
Sustainable Investing
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=801&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB801_.HTM |