HI SB799 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB799
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes condominium laws regarding sales to owner-occupants inapplicable to time share units. Increases the minimum number of residential units in a condominium project that must be offered for sale to prospective owner-occupants in the thirtyday period following the initial date of sale of the condominium from fifty per cent to ninety per cent. Effective 12/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Condominiums.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-03-25 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1379) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2021-03-23 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Aquino, DeCoite, Ilagan, Kitagawa, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2021-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 03-23-21 10:30AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred to HSG, CPC, referral sheet 17 |
2021-02-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-02-22 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 42) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-22-21. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 399) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Misalucha. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-21 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB272 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB799 (Carry Over) 2021-03-25 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
SB799 (Carry Over) 2021-03-25 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).