HI SB797 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB797

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides the chief information officer with the authority to approve, or expedite the approval process of, a state agency's management information system project that is budgeted at or more than $1,000,000, or any other project the chief information officer deems necessary to expedite, by coordinating and focusing appropriate state personnel and resources. Requires the chief information officer to annually report the status of all pending or completed projects over $1,000,000, including whether they are on time and on budget. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Office Of Enterprise Technology Services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-17 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-03-23HousePassed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
2021-03-23HouseReported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1229), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2021-03-17HouseThe committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.
2021-03-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 03-17-21 10:30AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-11HouseReferred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 22
2021-03-11HousePass First Reading
2021-03-09HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 278) in amended form (SD 1).
2021-03-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2021-03-05SenateOne Day Notice 03-09-21.
2021-03-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 960) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2021-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
2021-02-24SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
2021-02-18SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2021-02-18SenateReported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 359) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2021-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2021-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-21 3:00PM in conference room 016.
2021-01-27SenateReferred to GVO, WAM.
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB797 (Carry Over) 2021-03-23 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback