HI SB796 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB796
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts Waikiki from certain coastal zone management program policies relating to beach protection.
Title
Relating To Coastal Zone Management.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] |
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to AEN/WTL, WAM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB284 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB796 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to AEN/WTL, WAM.
SB796 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to AEN/WTL, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=796&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB796_.HTM |