HI SB781 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB781
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to LCA, JDC/CPN.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to LCA, JDC/CPN.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes forfeiture of certain employees' retirement system benefits for law enforcement officers who are convicted of an employment-related crime. Requires law enforcement officers under investigation for a felony offense to be placed on unpaid administrative leave, and if convicted, be permanently barred from employment as a law enforcement officer, private detective, or guard.
Title
Relating To Law Enforcement.
Sponsors
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Laura Acasio [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] |
Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to LCA, JDC/CPN. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB781 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to LCA, JDC/CPN.
HB1240 (Same As) 2021-02-01 - Referred to LAT, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
HB1240 (Same As) 2021-02-01 - Referred to LAT, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=781&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB781_.HTM |