HI SB773 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB773
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the issuance of certain new residential multi-family and commercial building application permits and new state building application permits initiated on or after January 1, 2022, unless the building's parking stalls are electric vehicle charger ready. Allows such buildings to implement an electric vehicle energy management system.
Title
Relating To Electric Vehicles.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to TRS/EET, JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1140 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB773 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to TRS/EET, JDC.
SB773 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to TRS/EET, JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=773&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB773_.HTM |