HI SB771 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires law enforcement officers and officers of justice to request and obtain a person's voluntary and informed consent prior to conducting a search of the person, the person's belongings, the person's residence, or the person's vehicle when conducting the search without a search warrant. Provides exceptions for law enforcement officers or officers of justice who have probable cause to believe that a person is armed and presents a danger to the officer's safety and for searches that are constitutionally justified by another precise, well-established and judicially approved exception to the search warrant requirement. (SD1)
Title
Law Enforcement Search Powers; Voluntary and Informed Consent
Sponsors
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 246) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Slom. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-15 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDL. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB310 (Same As) 2015-01-26 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 1