HI SB769 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-16 - Re-Referred to TSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-16 - Re-Referred to TSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Grants 20-year license for one stand-alone casino in Waikiki not in a hotel. Establishes Hawaii Gaming Control Commission. Imposes 15% wagering tax on gross receipts. Creates State Gaming Fund and Compulsive Gambler Program. Appropriates funds. Effective 07/01/2013.
Title
Stand-Alone Casino Gaming; Waikiki; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-16 | Senate | Re-Referred to TSM, WAM. |
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on THA deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-13-13 3:45PM in conference room 224. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on THA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-13 3:45PM in conference room 224. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Re-Referred to THA, WAM. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH/THA/JDL deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-14-13 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH/THA/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-13 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to EGH/THA/JDL, WAM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB145 (Same As) 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=769&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB769_.HTM |