HI SB761 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB761
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires places of public accommodation with at least one hundred parking spaces available for use by the general public to have at least three parking spaces exclusively for electric vehicles and be equipped with two electric vehicle charging systems located anywhere in the parking structure or lot by July 1, 2021. Requires places of public accommodation with at least fifty parking spaces available for use by the general public to have at least two parking spaces exclusively for electric vehicles and be equipped with an electric vehicle charging system located anywhere in the parking structure or lot by July 1, 2021.
Title
Relating To Electric Vehicles.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to TRS/EET, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB761 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to TRS/EET, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=761&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB761_.HTM |