HI SB760 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB760
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Codifies exemptions to permitting requirements established by Act 151, Session Laws of Hawaii 2011, within the Hawaii Revised Statutes and expands those exemptions to include broadband over wire line and wireless or mobile platforms, including wire line facilities and small wireless facilities. Establishes a definition of wireless communications antennas that include small wireless facilities. Establishes a definition of wire line. Repeals those sections of Act 151, Session Laws of Hawaii 2011, that have been codified within the Hawaii Revised Statutes. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Telecommunications.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-28 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-17 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH/WAM. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Reported from ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 519) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH/WAM. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ETT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Galuteria, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-17 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Re-Referred to ETT, CPH/WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to ETT, CPH. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB760 (Carry Over) 2017-02-28 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.